Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 09/06/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/05/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 12/05/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 12/05/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 12/05/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/05/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/05/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 12/05/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/05/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 12/05/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 12/05/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/05/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/05/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/05/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 12/05/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/05/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/05/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 12/05/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 12/05/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/05/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/05/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/22/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/22/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/22/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/22/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/22/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/22/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/22/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/22/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/22/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/22/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/22/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/22/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/22/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/22/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/22/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/22/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/30/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/30/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/30/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/30/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/30/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/30/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/30/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/30/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/30/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/30/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/30/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/30/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/30/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/31/1996
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/02/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 08/02/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/02/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/02/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/02/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/02/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/02/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/02/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 08/02/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/02/1996