Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/20/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 09/20/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/20/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/20/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/28/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/28/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 09/28/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/11/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/11/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/11/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/11/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/18/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/18/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/18/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/18/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/18/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 10/18/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/18/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/18/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/18/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/07/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/07/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/07/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/07/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/07/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/07/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/07/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 11/07/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/07/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/07/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/15/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/15/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/15/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/15/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 11/15/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/15/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/15/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/17/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/17/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/28/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/28/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/28/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/28/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/28/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/12/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/12/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 12/12/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/18/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 12/18/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 12/18/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 12/22/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 12/22/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/12/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/21/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/21/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/21/1996