Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 01/30/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 01/30/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/30/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/30/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/30/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/31/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/31/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/31/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/31/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/31/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/01/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/01/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/01/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/06/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/06/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/06/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/13/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/13/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/13/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/28/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/07/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/07/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/22/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/22/1996