Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/12/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/12/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/13/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/13/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/13/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/18/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/18/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/18/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/20/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/15/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/30/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/30/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/30/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/30/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/30/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/30/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/22/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/22/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/22/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/13/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/13/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/13/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/13/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/13/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/13/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/13/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/13/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/13/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/26/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/26/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/26/1996