Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 04/15/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/16/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/16/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/30/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/30/1996
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/30/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/30/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/30/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/30/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/30/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/30/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/30/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/30/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/30/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/30/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/30/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/30/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/30/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/06/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/06/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/06/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/06/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/06/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/06/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/06/1996
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 05/06/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/06/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/06/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/06/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 05/06/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/06/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/06/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/06/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/06/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/06/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/06/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/07/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/07/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/07/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/07/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/07/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/07/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/08/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/16/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/16/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/16/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/16/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/16/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/20/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/20/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/21/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/21/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/1996