Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/01/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/01/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/01/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/07/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 05/07/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/07/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/07/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/07/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/07/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/07/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/07/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/07/1996
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/07/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/07/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/09/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/09/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/09/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/09/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/09/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/09/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/09/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/09/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/09/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/09/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/09/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/09/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/09/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/09/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/09/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/09/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/09/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/21/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/21/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/21/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/05/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/05/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/05/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/05/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/05/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/05/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/05/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 06/05/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/05/1996