Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/27/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/27/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/27/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/08/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/11/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/11/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/24/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/24/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/29/1996