There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commending the Americans who served the United States during the period known as the Cold War.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
09/26/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/17/1996Committee on Intelligence (Permanent) discharged.
09/17/1996Committee on International Relations discharged.
09/17/1996Reported (Amended) by the Committee on National Security. H. Rept. 104-804, Part I.
05/22/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
09/26/1996SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/26/1996-11:03amHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/26/1996-11:03amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/1996-11:03amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/26/1996-10:34amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/26/1996-10:34amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11235-11239)
09/26/1996-10:34amHouseMr. Dornan moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
09/17/1996HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 278.
09/17/1996HouseCommittee on Intelligence (Permanent) discharged.
09/17/1996HouseCommittee on International Relations discharged.
09/17/1996HouseHouse Committee on Intelligence (Permanent) Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 17, 1996.
09/17/1996HouseHouse Committee on International Relations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 17, 1996.
09/17/1996HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on National Security. H. Rept. 104-804, Part I.
Action By: Committee on National Security
09/12/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on National Security
09/12/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on National Security
08/19/1996HouseFavorable Executive Comment Received from DOD.
Action By: Committee on National Security
06/03/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on National Security
06/03/1996HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
Action By: Committee on National Security
05/22/1996HouseReferred to House Intelligence (Permanent)
05/22/1996HouseReferred to House International Relations
05/22/1996HouseReferred to House National Security
05/22/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on National Security, and in addition to the Committees on International Relations, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/22/1996HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House National Security05/22/1996 Referred to
09/12/1996 Markup by
09/17/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-804
House National Security Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/03/1996 Referred to
House International Relations05/22/1996 Referred to
09/17/1996 Discharged from
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)05/22/1996 Referred to
09/17/1996 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.180. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/1996)

Commends and expresses gratitude and appreciation for the service and sacrifices of the members of the armed forces and civilian Government personnel who contributed to the historic victory in the Cold War.