Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/19/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/19/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/19/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/19/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/19/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/20/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/27/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/27/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/27/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/09/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/09/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/09/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/09/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/09/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/09/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/09/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/09/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/09/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/09/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/11/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/11/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 07/11/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/17/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/17/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/17/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/17/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/17/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/17/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/17/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/17/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/17/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/17/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/17/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/17/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/24/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/24/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/30/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/30/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/30/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/12/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/27/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/27/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/28/1996