Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/24/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/04/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/04/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/04/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/04/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/04/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/11/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/11/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/24/1996