Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/14/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/14/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/14/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/14/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/14/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/14/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/14/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/14/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/14/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/23/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/23/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/23/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/23/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/23/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/23/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/23/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/23/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/23/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/23/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/23/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/24/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/24/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/24/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/24/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/28/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/28/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/28/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/28/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/28/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/22/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/22/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/22/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/22/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/22/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/22/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/22/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/22/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/22/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/03/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/03/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/03/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/03/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/07/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/13/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/11/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/13/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/15/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/16/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/16/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/16/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/04/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/17/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/17/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/18/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/18/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/18/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/18/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/27/1996