Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/03/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/07/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/07/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/07/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/07/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/07/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/07/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/07/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/10/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/10/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/10/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/10/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/10/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/10/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 02/10/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/16/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/16/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/16/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/16/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/16/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/16/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/16/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/16/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/16/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/16/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/16/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/16/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/16/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/16/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/16/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/16/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/16/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 02/16/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/16/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 02/16/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/16/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/16/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/23/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 02/23/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/23/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/23/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/23/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/23/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/23/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/23/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/23/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/23/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 02/23/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/03/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/03/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/03/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/03/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/03/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/03/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/03/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/03/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/03/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/03/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/03/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/03/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/03/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/03/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/03/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/03/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/03/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/03/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/03/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/08/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/08/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/08/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/08/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/08/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/08/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/08/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 03/21/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/21/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/24/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/24/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/24/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/29/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/29/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/29/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/29/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/29/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/29/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/29/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/29/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/29/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/29/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/29/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 04/04/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/04/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/04/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/04/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/12/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/12/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/12/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/12/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/12/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/23/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/23/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/23/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/23/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/11/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/11/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/11/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/25/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/25/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/01/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/01/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/01/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/01/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/01/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/29/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/29/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/29/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/29/1996