Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/21/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/21/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/21/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/21/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/21/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/21/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/21/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/21/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/21/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/21/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/21/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/21/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/21/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/21/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/21/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/21/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/21/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/21/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/21/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/22/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/22/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/22/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/22/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/22/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/22/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/22/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/22/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/22/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/22/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/22/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/06/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/06/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/01/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/01/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/01/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/01/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/01/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 11/10/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/10/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/10/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/10/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/10/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/10/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/20/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/28/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/21/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/21/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/21/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/21/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/21/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/21/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/21/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/21/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/21/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/21/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/21/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/04/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/04/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/04/1996