Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/16/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/03/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/02/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/09/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/15/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/15/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/15/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/16/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/16/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/24/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/08/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 06/08/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/16/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/20/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/20/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/27/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/28/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/12/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/13/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/13/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/13/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/13/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/13/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/17/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 07/17/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/17/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/17/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/17/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/17/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/18/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/18/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/18/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/18/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/21/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/21/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/21/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/01/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/08/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/08/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/08/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/08/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/08/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/14/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 09/14/1995