Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/28/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/28/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/28/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/28/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/28/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/30/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/05/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/05/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/02/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/11/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/16/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/16/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/25/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/13/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/16/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/20/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/20/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/27/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/10/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/10/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/10/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/12/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/12/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/18/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/19/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 09/13/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/29/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/29/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/10/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/10/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/10/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/10/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/12/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/12/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/17/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/19/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/31/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/08/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/09/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/13/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/16/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/17/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/28/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/29/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/07/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/20/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/23/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/15/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/16/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/23/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/21/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/18/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/18/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/05/1996