Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/12/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/12/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/12/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/12/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/12/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/12/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/12/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/27/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/27/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/18/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/18/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 09/18/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/18/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/18/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/18/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/19/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/19/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/01/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/01/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/01/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/15/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/15/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/09/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/09/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/27/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/27/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/28/1996
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/13/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/13/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/13/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/19/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/24/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/01/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/14/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/04/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/04/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/11/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/11/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/23/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 07/23/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/23/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/05/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/05/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/17/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/17/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/18/1996