Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/02/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/02/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/02/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/17/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/17/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/06/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/06/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/16/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/22/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/22/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/28/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/24/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/24/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/01/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/18/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/18/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 12/05/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/11/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 12/11/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/11/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/11/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 12/14/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/14/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/21/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 01/22/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/22/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/24/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/25/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/25/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/29/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/11/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/16/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/18/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/19/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/04/1996