Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/13/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/13/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/13/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/06/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/18/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/25/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/05/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/11/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/12/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/23/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/23/1996