Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/08/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/08/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/17/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/17/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/17/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/17/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/17/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/21/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/14/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/14/1996