Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/14/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/14/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/14/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/15/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/16/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/20/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/28/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 12/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/14/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 12/14/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/25/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/12/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/1996