Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 11/28/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 11/28/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 11/28/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/28/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/28/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/05/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/05/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 12/12/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 12/12/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/12/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/19/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/19/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/13/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/13/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 03/14/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 04/23/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/16/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/05/1996