Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/01/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/06/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/06/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/07/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/14/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/14/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/14/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/14/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/21/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/21/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/21/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/27/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/27/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/27/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/15/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/15/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew