Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/13/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/13/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/13/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/13/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/22/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 09/04/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/17/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/17/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/17/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/17/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/28/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/03/1996