Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/11/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/11/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/23/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/23/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/23/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 01/23/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/23/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/23/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/23/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/23/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 01/23/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 01/25/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/25/1995