Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/11/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/11/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 01/11/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/19/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/31/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 02/01/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/02/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/09/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/28/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew