Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/13/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/13/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/13/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/13/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/13/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/13/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/13/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 01/13/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/13/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/13/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/13/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/13/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 01/13/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/19/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/19/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 01/19/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/19/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/19/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/19/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/19/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/19/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/24/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/24/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 01/24/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/27/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/27/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 02/01/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/01/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/01/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/09/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/27/1995