Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/28/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/07/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/07/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/07/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/07/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/07/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/07/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 03/07/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/07/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/13/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/13/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/13/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/13/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/13/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/13/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/13/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/13/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/13/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/13/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/13/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/21/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/21/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/28/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/28/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/28/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/28/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/28/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/28/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/28/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/28/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/28/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/28/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/11/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/11/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/11/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/11/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/11/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/11/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/11/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/11/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/21/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/17/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/31/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/10/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/17/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/25/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/07/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/07/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/07/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/07/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/28/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/28/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/28/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/29/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/25/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/22/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/23/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/23/1996