Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/08/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/08/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/08/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/10/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/10/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/10/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/10/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/10/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/15/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/15/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/15/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/15/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/15/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/15/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/15/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/21/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/21/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/23/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/23/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/23/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/23/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/23/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/23/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/23/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/23/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/23/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/28/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/28/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/28/1995