Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/25/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/10/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/15/1995