Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/16/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/04/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/04/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/04/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/04/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/04/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/04/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/04/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/04/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/04/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/04/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/04/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/04/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/01/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/01/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/01/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/01/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/01/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/01/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/01/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/01/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 05/01/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/01/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/01/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/01/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/01/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/01/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/01/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/01/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/01/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/01/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/23/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/23/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/23/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/23/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/23/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/23/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/23/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/23/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/14/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/14/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/14/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/19/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 07/19/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/19/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/19/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/19/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/19/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/19/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/19/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/19/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/19/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/19/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/19/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/07/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 09/07/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 10/10/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/10/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/10/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/10/1995