Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/06/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/06/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/06/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/06/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/06/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/06/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/06/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/06/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/06/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/06/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/06/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/06/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/06/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/07/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/07/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/07/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/02/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/02/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/02/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/02/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/02/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/02/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/16/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/16/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/19/1995