Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 01/11/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/11/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/18/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/18/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/18/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/18/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/18/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/18/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/18/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/18/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/18/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/18/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 01/18/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/18/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 01/18/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/18/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 01/20/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/20/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/20/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/20/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 01/20/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/20/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/20/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/20/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/20/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/23/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/23/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/23/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/24/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/25/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/25/1995