Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/25/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/25/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/25/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/31/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 01/31/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/31/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/31/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/31/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/31/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/31/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/1996
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/31/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/31/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/31/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/06/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/06/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/06/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/06/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/06/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/06/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/06/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/06/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/06/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/06/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/06/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/06/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/06/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/14/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/27/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/27/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/15/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/15/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/15/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/09/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/09/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/09/1996