Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/01/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/01/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/01/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/09/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/09/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/09/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/14/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/14/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/28/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/28/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/28/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/28/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/28/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/28/1996
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/28/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/29/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/29/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/29/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/25/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/23/1996