Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/19/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/30/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 01/30/1995
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 01/30/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/30/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/30/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/30/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/30/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 01/30/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/30/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 01/30/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/30/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 01/30/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/30/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/30/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/03/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/03/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/03/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/03/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 02/03/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/03/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/06/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/06/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/06/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/08/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/08/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/08/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/10/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/03/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/23/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/06/1995