Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/21/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/21/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/21/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/23/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/23/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/23/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/29/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/29/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/30/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/04/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/10/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/11/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/18/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/18/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/18/1996