Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/19/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/25/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/25/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/25/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/25/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/26/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/26/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/26/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/26/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/27/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/09/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/09/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/09/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 07/10/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/10/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/11/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/17/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/17/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/18/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/24/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1996