Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/16/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/16/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 07/16/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 07/16/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/23/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/30/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 07/31/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/31/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/11/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/11/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/25/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/27/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/27/1996