Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 08/02/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 09/11/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/11/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/26/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/28/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/28/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/02/1996