Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 08/02/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/04/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/04/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/04/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/04/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/04/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/04/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/18/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/18/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/18/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/18/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/18/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/18/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/18/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/18/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/18/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/18/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/18/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 09/18/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/20/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/20/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 09/20/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/20/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/20/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/20/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/24/1996
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/24/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/24/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/24/1996