There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Regulatory Procedures Reform Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reform regulatory procedures, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/29/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
07/21/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10488-10489)
Action By: Senate
07/13/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9862-9863)
Action By: Senate
07/12/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9785-9786)
Action By: Senate
07/11/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9662-9665, S9669-9670)
Action By: Senate
06/30/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9481-9482, S9490-9491)
Action By: Senate
06/29/1995Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate
06/29/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9447-9449)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs06/29/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1001.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1001. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/29/1995)

Regulatory Procedures Reform Act of 1995 - Amends Federal Government operations law on regulatory function analysis, among other things, to revise judicial review provisions.

Defines "major rule" as a rule or group of closely related rules not expressly excluded from coverage under this Act that the proposing agency, Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), or presidential designee determines is likely to affect the economy each year, directly or indirectly, in a specified manner.

Requires Federal agencies: (1) before publishing rulemaking notices, to determine whether or not the rule in question is a major rule (giving the OMB Director or presidential designee as appropriate the authority to make certain redeterminations); and (2) when publishing a rulemaking notice for a major rule, issue an initial cost-benefit analysis, and, later, when the final major rule is published, a final analysis, with specified contents, along with an appropriate summary for each analysis.

Requires initial analysis to contain risk assessments prepared by covered agency heads based on the best available scientific information in accordance with adopted guidelines incorporating specified requirements, including those for peer review panels, if a major rule addresses health, safety, or environmental risks as well as benefit assessments of risk reductions associated with regulatory alternatives.

Prescribes executive oversight authority and requirements.

Amends Federal Government operations law to add provisions governing congressional review of agency rulemaking, requiring promulgated final major rules to be submitted to the Congress for review in accordance with specified procedures before they take effect.

Requires certain risk assessment and other specified studies by the Administrative Conference of the United States for a report to the Congress.

Outlines provisions for: (1) encouraging covered Federal agencies engaged in regulating health, safety, and environmental risks to achieve the greatest overall net risk reduction at the least cost practical through appropriate priorities included in the agency's budget and planning; (2) promoting coordination risk reduction policies and programs and open communication between Federal entities and the public regarding risk prevention and management; and (3) comparative risk analysis and a certain methodological study provided for by OMB. Limits judicial review under this paragraph.

Details provisions requiring certain biennial accounting statements from the President to the Congress, along with an associated report with appropriate program recommendations, estimating annual regulatory costs and corresponding benefits in accordance with specified guidelines, with appropriate recommendations for improvements from the Congressional Budget Office to the President after such statements and reports have been submitted to the Congress. Requires guidance from OMB for standardized agency cost-benefit measures and statement format. States that regulatory accounting requirements shall not be subject to judicial review.