There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Anticounterfeiting Consumer Protection Act of 1996

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Anticounterfeiting Consumer Protection Act of 1996

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Anticounterfeiting Consumer Protection Act of 1995

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Anticounterfeiting Consumer Protection Act of 1995

Short Titles as Introduced

Anticounterfeiting Consumer Protection Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to control and prevent commercial counterfeiting, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/02/1996Became Public Law No: 104-153. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/1996Signed by President.
06/24/1996Presented to President.
06/14/1996Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6302-6303)
06/04/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
12/13/1995Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S18580-18582)
11/28/1995Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with amendments. With written report No. 104-177.
08/09/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
07/02/1996Became Public Law No: 104-153. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/1996Signed by President.
06/24/1996SenatePresented to President.
06/18/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/14/1996SenateSenate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6302-6303)
06/05/1996SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill and House requests a conference.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 2511 was laid on the table without objection.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseThe Speaker appointed conferees: Hyde, Moorhead, Goodlatte, Conyers, and Schroeder.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseOn motion that the House insist upon its amendment, and request a conference Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H5781)
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseMr. Moorhead asked unanimous consent that the House insist upon its amendment, and request a conference.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 2511. Agreed to without objection.
06/04/1996-3:07pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5780-5781)
06/04/1996-3:06pmHouseMr. Moorhead asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
12/14/1995-11:52amHouseHeld at the desk.
12/14/1995SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/14/1995-10:01amHouseReceived in the House.
12/13/1995SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S18580-18582)
11/28/1995SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 250.
11/28/1995SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with amendments. With written report No. 104-177.
10/26/1995SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
10/10/1995SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 104-830.
08/09/1995SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
08/09/1995SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S12083)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary08/09/1995 Referred to
10/10/1995 Hearings by
10/26/1995 Markup by
11/28/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-177

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1136. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/04/1996)

Anticounterfeiting Consumer Protection Act of 1996 - Makes the following (counterfeiting offenses) predicate offenses under the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act: (1) trafficking in counterfeit labels for phonorecords, computer programs or computer program documentation or packaging and copies of motion pictures or other audiovisual works; (2) criminal copyright infringement; (3) unauthorized fixation of and trafficking in sound recordings and music videos of live music performances; (4) trafficking in goods or services bearing counterfeit marks; and (5) interstate transportation of stolen property.

(Sec. 4) Amends the Federal criminal code to extend to computer programs and computer program documentation and packaging existing prohibitions and penalties applicable to trafficking in counterfeit labels affixed or designed to be affixed to phonorecords or copies of a motion picture or other audiovisual work.

(Sec. 5) Requires the Attorney General to include in a report to the Congress, on a district by district basis, an accounting of all actions taken by the Department of Justice that involve counterfeiting offenses.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Lanham Act to: (1) require the court to order the seizure of an aircraft, vehicle, or vessel used in connection with a violation of such Act; and (2) permit the plaintiff, in a case involving the use of a counterfeit mark in connection with the sale, offering for sale, or distribution of goods or services, to recover, instead of actual damages and profits, an award of statutory damages, as specified.

(Sec. 8) Repeals a provision allowing forfeited articles that are excluded from importation under Federal copyright law to be refunded to the country of export whenever it is shown that the importer had no reasonable grounds for believing that his or her acts constituted a violation of law.

(Sec. 9) Amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to: (1) direct the Secretary of the Treasury, after forfeiture of merchandise bearing a counterfeit American trademark, to destroy the merchandise; or (2) alternatively, authorize the Secretary to obliterate the trademark where feasible and dispose of the goods seized as specified if the merchandise is not unsafe or a hazard to health and the Secretary has the consent of the trademark owner.

(Sec. 10) Establishes civil penalties for aiding and abetting the importation for sale or public distribution of merchandise that is seized for bearing a counterfeit American trademark. Sets limits on fines for first and subsequent seizures, based on the value that the merchandise would have had if it were genuine. Specifies that the imposition of such fine shall be within the discretion of the Customs Service and in addition to any other civil or criminal penalty or other remedy authorized by law.

(Sec. 11) Provides for the public disclosure of aircraft manifests.

(Sec. 12) Directs the Secretary to require that entry documentation contain information necessary to determine whether the imported merchandise bears an infringing trademark.

(Sec. 13) Includes within the definition of "contraband": (1) a counterfeit label for a phonorecord, computer program or its documentation or packaging, or motion picture or other audiovisual work; (2) a phonorecord or copy that criminally infringes a copyright; (3) a prohibited unauthorized fixation of a sound recording or music video of a live musical performance; or (4) any good bearing a counterfeit mark.