Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 08/09/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 08/09/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 08/09/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 08/09/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 08/09/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 08/09/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 08/11/1995
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 08/11/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/25/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/17/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 10/27/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/08/1995