Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/19/1995
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/19/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/02/1995
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 11/15/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/21/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/21/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/17/1996
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/17/1996
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/30/1996
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/03/1996
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/13/1996
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/13/1996
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/13/1996
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/14/1996
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/14/1996
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/21/1996
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/21/1996
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/05/1996