Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 08/10/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/28/1995
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/28/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 10/24/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/24/1995
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/24/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/24/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/24/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/24/1995
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/24/1995
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/24/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 10/24/1995
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 11/09/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/09/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 12/12/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 12/22/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 12/22/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/06/1996
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/14/1996
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/14/1996
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/14/1996
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/22/1996
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 05/23/1996
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/23/1996
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/10/1996
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/1996