There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Campaign Finance Reform bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Senate Campaign Finance Reform Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reform the financing of Federal elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/20/1996Senate Committee on Rules discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/07/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date
06/25/1996Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 456.
Action By: Senate
06/25/1996Cloture not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54-46. Record Vote No: 168. (consideration: CR S6817)
Action By: Senate
06/25/1996Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6761-6817)
Action By: Senate
06/24/1996Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S6680-6718)
Action By: Senate
06/20/1996Cloture motion presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S6630)
Action By: Senate
06/20/1996S.Amdt.4092 Amendment SP 4092 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
06/20/1996S.Amdt.4092 Proposed by Senator Lott for Senator McCain. In the nature of a substitute.
Action By: Senate
06/20/1996Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6630)
Action By: Senate
06/20/1996Senate Committee on Rules discharged by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
06/20/1996S.Amdt.4084 Referred to the Committee on Rules.
05/15/1996Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
03/27/1996Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
02/01/1996Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
09/07/1995Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.
Action By: Senate
09/07/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S12831-12832)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration09/07/1995 Referred to
05/15/1996 Hearings by
06/20/1996 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.1219.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1219. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/07/1995)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Senate Election Spending Limits and Benefits

Title II: Reduction of Special Interest Influence

Subtitle A: Elimination of Political Action Committees

From Federal Election Activities

Subtitle B: Provisions Relating to Soft Money of

Political Parties

Subtitle C: Soft Money of Persons Other Than Political Parties

Subtitle D: Contributions

Subtitle E: Additional Contribution Limits

Subtitle F: Independent Expenditures

Title III: Miscellaneous Provisions

Senate Campaign Finance Reform Act of 1995 - Title I: Senate Election Spending Limits and Benefits - Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 (FECA) to set forth Senate election spending limits and benefits. Entitles complying candidates to specified: (1) broadcast discounts and free time; and (2) postage reductions.

(Sec. 103) Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to: (1) provide for preemption only in situations beyond a station's control; and (2) extend the license revocation provision for failure to provide access to cable systems.

Title II: Reduction of Special Interest Influence - Subtitle A: Elimination of Political Action Committees From Federal Election Activities - Amends FECA to prohibit Federal election activities by political action committees (as defined by this Act). States that if such ban is not in effect: (1) a committee's contributions to a candidate shall not exceed limits applicable to an individual; and (2) a candidate may not accept more than 20 percent of contributions from committee sources.

Subtitle B: Provisions Relating to Soft Money of Political Parties - Amends FECA to set forth soft money contribution and reporting provisions.

Subtitle C: Soft Money of Persons Other Than Political Parties - Amends FECA to set forth reporting requirements for persons other than political parties (with exceptions for candidate's authorized committees or independent expenditures) who disburse more than $2000 for political activities.

Subtitle D: Contributions - Amends FECA to set forth conditions under which contributions to a candidate made by a person through an intermediary or conduit shall be treated as having come from the person or from the intermediary.

Subtitle E: Additional Prohibitions on Contributions - Requires candidates to raise at least 60 percent of their contributions from in-State individuals in order to be in FECA compliance.

Subtitle F: Independent Expenditures - Amends FECA to redefine "independent expenditure." Includes within the definition of "contribution" certain expenditures containing express advocacy made by a candidate or candidate's representative.

Title III: Miscellaneous Provisions - Amends FECA to prohibit the personal use of campaign funds.

(Sec. 302) Sets forth political advertising provisions for print and broadcast or cablecast communications.

(Sec. 303) Authorizes the Federal Election Commission to: (1) prescribe regulations for computer and facsimile reporting; and (2) conduct random post-election audits to ensure voluntary FECA compliance.

(Sec. 305) Prohibits franked mass mailings by a Member in his or her election year (unless such Member will not be a candidate for any Federal office).

(Sec. 306) Grants the Commission injunctive relief authority.

(Sec. 308) Provides for direct appeal to the United States Supreme Court from any judicial ruling on the constitutionality of any provision of this Act.

(Sec. 309) Revises certain political committee reporting requirements.