Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/08/1995
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/08/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/14/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/20/1995
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/13/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/16/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/19/1995
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/17/1996