There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Child Pornography Prevention Act of 1996

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill
  • Amber Hagerman Child Protection Act of 1996

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Pornography Prevention Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend certain provisions of law relating to child pornography, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/27/1996By Senator Hatch from Committee on Judiciary filed written report under the authority of the order of Aug 2, 96. Report No. 104-358. Additional and minority views filed.
07/30/1996Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/13/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
08/27/1996By Senator Hatch from Committee on Judiciary filed written report under the authority of the order of Aug 2, 96. Report No. 104-358. Additional and minority views filed.
Action By: Senate
07/30/1996Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 545.
Action By: Senate
07/30/1996Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/25/1996Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/04/1996Committee on Judiciary. Hearings held.
09/13/1995Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate
09/13/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S13542-13543)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary09/13/1995 Referred to
06/04/1996 Hearings by
07/25/1996 Markup by
07/30/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-358

No related bill information was received for S.1237.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1237. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/30/1996)

Child Pornography Prevention Act of 1996 - Amends the Federal criminal code to prohibit and set penalties for specified activities relating to material: (1) constituting or containing child pornography, including knowingly possessing any book, magazine, periodical, film, videotape, computer disk, or other material that contains three or more images of child pornography (and enhances penalties if the offender has a prior Federal or State conviction relating to aggravated sexual abuse, sexual abuse, abusive sexual conduct involving a minor or ward, or for specified activities relating to child pornography (prior conviction)); and (2) depicting the sexual exploitation of minors, including knowingly mailing, or transporting or shipping in interstate or foreign commerce, including by computer, any visual depiction created, adapted, or modified to appear that an identifiable minor is engaged in sexually explicit conduct. Revises the definition of "visual depiction" to include data stored on computer disk or by electronic means which is capable of conversion into a visual image.

Increases and expands the scope of penalties for sexual exploitation of children. Revises provisions regarding activities relating to material involving the sexual exploitation of minors, including providing enhanced penalties for offenders having a prior conviction.

Amends the Privacy Protection Act of 1980 to authorize certain searches and seizures of work product materials and other documents if an offense involves the production, possession, receipt, mailing, sale, distribution, shipment, or transportation of child pornography, or the sale or purchase of children.

Amber Hagerman Child Protection Act of 1996 - Modifies code provisions regarding aggravated sexual abuse and sexual abuse of a minor, including by: (1) setting penalties for crossing a State line with intent to engage in a sexual act with a person under age 12; and (2) providing for life imprisonment (unless the death penalty is imposed) for violation of such provisions if the defendant has previously been convicted of specified Federal or State offenses involving aggravated sexual abuse or sexual abuse of a minor.