There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to disapprove of amendments to the Federal Sentencing Guidelines relating to lowering of crack sentences and sentences for money laundering and transactions in property derived from unlawful activity.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/30/1995Became Public Law No: 104-38. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/1995Signed by President.
10/25/1995Presented to President.
10/18/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/29/1995Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/18/1995Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
10/30/1995Became Public Law No: 104-38. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/1995Signed by President.
10/25/1995SenatePresented to President.
10/18/1995-9:05pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 2259 was laid on the table without objection.
10/18/1995-9:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/18/1995-9:04pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/18/1995-9:04pmHouseThe previous question was ordered without objection.
10/18/1995-9:04pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2259 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be read by section. A specified amendment is in order. An amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of S. 1254, as passed by the Senate, shall be considered as adopted in the Committee of the Whole and in the House. The bill, as amended, shall be considered as an original bill for the purpose of further amendment. No further amendment shall be in order except the amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in the report of the Committee on Rules accompanying this resolution, debatable for 1 hour and not subject to amendment. After passage of the bill, it shall be in order to take from the Sp eaker's table and consider the bill S. 1254. It shall be in order to move to strike all afte...
10/18/1995-9:04pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 237. (consideration: CR H10283-10284)
10/06/1995-10:38amHouseHeld at the desk.
10/06/1995-10:38amHouseReceived in the House.
10/02/1995SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/1995SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/29/1995SenateS.Amdt.2879 Amendment SP 2879 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
09/29/1995SenateS.Amdt.2879 Proposed by Senator Coats for Senator Kennedy. To provide for a reduction in sentencing disparities.
09/29/1995SenateMeasure laid before Senate. (consideration: CR S14779-14782)
09/25/1995SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
09/18/1995SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/18/1995SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S13738-13740)

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (0)

As of 05/26/2019 text has not been received for S.1254 - A bill to disapprove of amendments to the Federal Sentencing Guidelines relating to lowering of crack sentences and sentences for money laundering and transactions in property derived from unlawful activity.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1254. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/29/1995)

Disapproves the U.S. Sentencing Commission's amendments to the Sentencing Guidelines relating to: (1) equalization of crack and cocaine powder quantities for trafficking and possession offenses; and (2) money laundering and transactions in property derived from unlawful activity.

(Sec. 2) Directs the Sentencing Commission to submit to the Congress recommendations regarding changes to the statutes and Sentencing Guidelines governing sentences for unlawful manufacturing, importing, exporting, and trafficking of cocaine and like offenses. Requires the recommendations to reflect the following considerations: (1) the sentence for trafficking in crack cocaine should generally exceed that imposed for trafficking in a like quantity of powder cocaine; (2) high-level cocaine traffickers should generally receive longer sentences than low-level traffickers; (3) a defendant who knowingly traffics in powder cocaine that will be converted into crack cocaine prior to its distribution to individuals should be treated at sentencing as though the defendant had trafficked in crack cocaine; and (4) an enhanced sentence should generally be imposed on a defendant who, in the course of an offense, murders or causes serious bodily injury to an individual, uses a dangerous weapon or possesses a firearm, involves a juvenile, a pregnant woman, or an unusually vulnerable person, engages in a continuing criminal enterprise or commits other criminal offenses in order to facilitate drug trafficking activities, restrains a victim, traffics in cocaine within 500 feet of a school, obstructs justice, has a significant prior criminal record, or is an organizer or leader of drug trafficking activities involving five or more persons.

Specifies that such recommendations shall propose revision of the drug quantity ratio of crack cocaine to powder cocaine under the relevant statutes and guidelines in a manner consistent with the ratios set for other drugs.

Requires: (1) the Department of Justice (DOJ) to report to the House and Senate Judiciary Committees on the charging and plea practices of Federal prosecutors with respect to money laundering; and (2) the Sentencing Commission to submit to such committees' comments on the DOJ report.