Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 10/12/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 10/12/1995
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/01/1995
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/08/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 11/14/1995
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/14/1995
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/14/1995
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/14/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/14/1995
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 11/14/1995
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/14/1995
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/20/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/20/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/29/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/29/1995
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/29/1995
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 11/29/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 11/29/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 11/29/1995